THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:47:26 AM
McGrath, Michael Murray John
CPSO#:
23826
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael McGrath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2017 |