THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 0:11:36 AM
Huggins, David Greenwood
CPSO#:
23819
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.G.Huggins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |