THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:56:56 PM
Hurwitz, Gilbert Allan
CPSO#:
23729
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gilbert Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Image Report Records will be available at St. Michael's Hospital.
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 01 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Apr 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |