THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:20:59 AM
Aizenman, Allan Israel
CPSO#:
23682
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |