THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:24:48 PM
Freedman, Paul Edward
CPSO#:
23615
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 May 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2023 |