THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:05:54 PM
Sniderman, Kenneth Wilfred
CPSO#:
23607
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
19 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kenneth W. Sniderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:29 Lower Village Gate
Toronto ON M5P 3L7
Date Received: 18 Feb 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Feb 2020 |