THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:13:27 PM
Patry, Mark Gerard
CPSO#:
23525
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 May 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 May 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 May 2000 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2000
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Mark Gerard Patry signed an agreement with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) on October 16, 2000, that the following shall appear on the public register of the CPSO:
Dr. Patry resigned from practice, and undertook not to reapply for a licence in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, and he did so in light of pending allegations of incompetence referred to the Discipline Committee of the CPSO.
On October 18, 2000, the allegations against Dr. Mark Gerard Patry were withdrawn.