THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:00:22 PM
Pugsley, Stewart Oliver
CPSO#:
23444
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1) Paper records from 2011 onward under the jurisdiction of the Medical Records Dept at St. Joseph's Healthcare, Hamilton
2) EMR (EPIC/Dovetail) records since September 2018 at St. Joseph's Healthcare, Hamilton
Date Received: 01 Sep 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2022 |