THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:13:19 AM
Frost, Peter Graham
CPSO#:
23327
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Frost Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017
Corporation Name: P. Frost, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2021 |