THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:35:23 AM
Trossman, Bernard
CPSO#:
23286
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Nov 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B. Trossman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Trossman has advised the College that his medical records are being stored by:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Website: http://www.rsrs.com
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 06 Dec 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1962 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |