THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:19:43 AM
McCall, John Gerald
CPSO#:
23070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
55 Victoria Avenue
P.O. Box 360
South East Grey Community Centre
Markdale ON N0C 1H0
Phone: (519) 986-2222
Fax: (519) 986-3999
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 1, 2020, Grey Bruce Health Services (GBHS) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. John McCall voluntarily resigned his surgical privileges at GBHS during the course of preliminary investigation by GBHS into Dr. McCall's surgical practice at GBHS.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:13 May 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN GERALD MCCALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1970 to 31 Dec 1970
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1970 |