THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:41:55 PM
Isaac, Errol Barrymore
CPSO#:
23021
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suites 2 and 3
760 Brant Street
Burlington ON L7R 4B7
Phone: (905) 637-7606
Fax: (905) 637-2139
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Errol Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2007
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERROL BARRYMORE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1970 |