THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:26:31 PM
Tzeneff, Simeon Georges
CPSO#:
23006
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-Dec-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Simeon Georges Tzeneff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 1, 2019:
Dr. Tzeneff has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.