THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:35:38 PM
Chaiton, Abraham
CPSO#:
22831
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 405
Toronto ON M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 741-2456
Fax: (416) 741-2454
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:07 Mar 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM CHAITON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAITON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1970 |