THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:50:29 AM
Cohen, Zane
CPSO#:
22788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Feb 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Feb 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 451
600 university ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8346
Fax: (416) 586-8644
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:04 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZANE COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Feb 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1977 |