THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:55:59 PM
Grosser, Norman
CPSO#:
22724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Apr 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Evans Occupational Health Clinic
233 Evans Ave.
Toronto ON M8Z 1J6
Phone: (905) 526-9744 Ext. 1280
Fax: 905-522-0425
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1970 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 18 Sep 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1986 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 1986 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 1986 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Sep 1984
Summary:
In September 1984, Dr. Grosser pleaded guilty to a charge of incompetence, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Dr. Grosser further pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he falsified a record in respect of the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 27(16); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of the prescription or sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Discipline Committee accepted these pleas, and found Dr. Grosser guilty of incompetence and professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Grosser(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 17, 1984
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 11 Apr 1986
Decision: Application Accepted