THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:58:42 AM
Goldbach, Martin Manus
CPSO#:
22705
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Goldbach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 30, 2020, London Health Sciences Centre notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Martin Goldbach voluntarily resigned his privileges at London Health Sciences Centre and at St. Joseph’s Health Care London, effective March 15, 2020.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |