THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:45:47 PM
Swain, John Richard
CPSO#:
22551
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Feb 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of London, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Swain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2010
Corporation Name: John Richard Swain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Glarier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa, Ontario
L1H 2J9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |