THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:20:27 AM
Nizami, Riaz Munir
CPSO#:
22497
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Dec 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Riaz Munir Nizami, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).
I, Dr. Riaz Nizami have voluntarily resigned from the College effective April 1, 2013, and have undertaken not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after April 1, 2013.