THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:37:17 PM
Sultan, Abdel Mohsen Ibrahim
CPSO#:
22382
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Sep 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
1-Aug-2004
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2000 |