THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:08:58 AM
Ball, Daniel Glen
CPSO#:
21979
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Daniel G. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 Dec 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2017 |