THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:39:36 PM
Letts, Robert Mervyn
CPSO#:
21796
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jan 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Mar 2015 |