THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:29:02 PM
Angel, Aubie
CPSO#:
21728
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:B17 - 2 Champagne Dr
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Aubie Angel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 12, 2018:
Dr. Angel has retired from the practice of medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.