THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:46:00 AM
Likar, Ivan
CPSO#:
21494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1968
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of London, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3111 Bloor Street West
Unit 202
Etobicoke ON M8X 2W2
Phone: 647 351 6646
Fax: 647 351 6648
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN LIKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIKAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2024 |