THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:50:43 AM
Death, Arthur Barry
CPSO#:
21469
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Dec 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.B. Death Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Parkwood Hospital
550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)