THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:21:52 PM
Richie, Steven Jerome
CPSO#:
21422
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
83 Parkside Drive
Brantford ON N3T 5G4
Phone: 226 920 5211
Fax: (519) 759-0655
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN JEROME RICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Feb 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1970 |