THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:32:17 PM
Fung, Carl Anthony Rhodes
CPSO#:
21197
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request via fax to 905-934-9694. Patients seeking a copy of their medical record after June 30, 2022 should contact RSRS via telephone at 416-398-0638 and 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 10 Jan 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 1, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from June 30, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Carl Anthony Rhodes Fung in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
Concerns were expressed with respect to Dr. Fung’s family practice. As Dr. Fung was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Fung agreeing to resign from the College effective July 1, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)