THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:06:45 AM
Lipson, Frank
CPSO#:
21157
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Dec 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records
Management Ltd.
Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 19 Jun 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2022 |