THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:38:47 PM
Zizzo, Angelo Joseph
CPSO#:
20733
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
02 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jun 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Apr-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Zizzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Suite 201 - 325 Winterberry Drive, Hamilton, ON, L8J 0B6.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1972 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 02 Apr 2020 |