THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:36:52 AM
Kardash, Sidney
CPSO#:
20703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 May 1967
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Champlain LHIN
4200 Labelle St suite100
Ottawa K1J1J8
Ottawa ON K1J1J8
Phone: 6137476784
Fax: 6137456984
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record can contact:
File Bank
Tel: 1-800-377-3453
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019
Instructions/Address:Dr. Sidney Kardash has indicated that former patients may email him at [email protected] to request copies of their medical records
Date Received: 14 Aug 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIDNEY KARDASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARDASH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Feb 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1969 |