THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:35:11 PM
Lee, John York Hon
CPSO#:
20633
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Apr 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records should be directed to the Trenton Memorial Hospital.
Date Received: 16 May 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:12 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Apr 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |