THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:02:25 AM
Listgarten, Charles
CPSO#:
20555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
57 Weeping Willow Lane
Thornhill ON L3T3R9
Phone: (905) 707-1168
Fax: (905 707-1168
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES LISTGARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISTGARTEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1966 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 1970 |