THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:59:29 AM
Hawke, Michael
CPSO#:
19996
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hawke, William Michael (used until: 09 Aug 2001 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical records should contact Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. by phone at (1-888-563-3732)
Date Received: 21 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2022 |