THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:58:00 PM
Hauffe, Herbert Wulff Dietrich
CPSO#:
19842
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Apr 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Nov 1994
Summary:
In November 1994, Dr. Hauffe pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Hauffe guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee agreed to a joint submission as to penalty, and consequently ordered that Dr. Hauffe be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that Dr. Hauffe's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 24, 1994