THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:36:44 AM
Spudas, Alexander Jonas
CPSO#:
19746
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Lithuanian
Education: Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene St,
North York, ON
M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 3, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Spudas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 3, 2020:
Dr. Spudas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.