THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:50:45 AM
Gans, Marvin Howard
CPSO#:
19609
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marvin Gans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
or
Call toll free at: 1-800-775-0093 or visit www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2022 |