THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:55:20 PM
Ing, Robert Yun Kwing
CPSO#:
19353
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ng, Robert Yun Kwing (used until: 13 Jan 1993 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Tulane University School of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Apr 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Sep 1991 |