THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:53:05 AM
Prince, Garry Edward
CPSO#:
19296
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Fax: 1 888 316 4125
Date Received: 29 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1964 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Dec 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Garry Edward Prince to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 14, 2016.
Dr. Prince was the subject of College investigations into his practice. In particular, Dr. Prince was the subject of investigations into his standard of care and into breaches of his confirmation to Health Canada that he had relinquished some of his prescribing privileges. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Prince resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)