THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:43:57 AM
Berlin, Solomon
CPSO#:
18682
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
24-Feb-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Berlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may contact Docudavit Solutions Inc. as per above.
Docudavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 416-781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |