THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:02:27 AM
Bury, Katherine Diane
CPSO#:
18681
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Feb 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Bury indicated that all of her patient files are in the custody of the clinic where the patient received care.
Date Received: 22 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1964 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2013 |