THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:00:22 AM
McDonald, Donald John
CPSO#:
17860
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
09 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Records Management Limited
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
emial: [email protected]
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015
Instructions/Address:Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:02 Dec 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2014 |