THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:35:50 PM
Fisher, Murray Malcolm
CPSO#:
17683
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Digestive Health Clinic, 301-1366 Yonge Street, Toronto, Ontario M4T 3A7
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1960 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1961 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2019 |