THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:51:30 PM
Rumball, William James Stuart
CPSO#:
17653
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jun 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1959 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1960 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 May 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |