THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:49:20 PM
Kohari, Joseph
CPSO#:
17273
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Sep 1959
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Aug-2004
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1937
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1959 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1998 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1981
Summary:
In August 1981, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kohari guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of incompetence. The Committee further found Dr. Kohari guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Kohari's licence to practice be suspended for a period of twelve months, but that the imposition of this penalty was itself to be suspended.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1983-04-29
Hearing Date(s): 10 Aug 1981