THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:43:00 AM
Forbath, Peter Gyorgy
CPSO#:
17077
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
03 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hungarian
Education: Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1949
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Nov 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1959 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jul 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter G. Forbath to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2018:
Dr. Forbath has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.