THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:34:26 PM
Gay, Brian Cameron
CPSO#:
16889
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Apr 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:28 Dec 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 1958 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1999 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1999 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2005 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jan 2005
Summary:
On January 12, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brian Cameron Gay committed professional misconduct in that in engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by member as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of two months commencing on February 1, 2005;
2. Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s certificate of registration will be subject to the indefinite condition of ongoing monitoring at his own expense, by a physician acceptable to the College, who will:
i) meet with Dr. Brian Cameron Gay a minimum of once every two months to review and discuss his charts for the purpose of ensuring compliance with this order and his undertaking; and
ii) will report to the College a minimum of once every three months;
3. A College representative, including but not limited to Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s approved practice monitor, will be entitled to inspect his practice(s), office(s), and patient charts at any time without notice for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing compliance with the terms of this order and of his undertaking with the College;
4. If the College receives information indicating that Dr. Brian Cameron Gay has breached his undertaking with the College or the terms of this Order, the Registrar will be entitled to immediately suspend his certificate of registration pending an investigation and a report to the Executive Committee; and
5. Dr. Brian Cameron Gay pay the College $2,500.00 in costs.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 12, 2005