THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:13:43 AM
Bruckschwaiger, Otto
CPSO#:
16823
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Aug 1958
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
23-Jan-2004
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian
Education: University of Vienna, 1940
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1954 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Urology |
Effective:01 Jan 1957 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1958 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |