THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:23:16 PM
Gagliano, Anthony
CPSO#:
15941
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Sep 1956
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Messina, 1949
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 1, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTICE OF RESTRICTIONS OF PRIVILEGES:
On October 23, 2008, Centre for Addiction and Mental Health notified the College that Dr. Anthony Gagliano's privileges are restricted effective October 1, 2008.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1956 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2011 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 2004
Summary:
On May 4, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gagliano committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by providing an incorrect date of birth in his application and re-applications for medical staff appointment to the William Osler Heath Centre, in order to make himself appear younger so that he would be accepted as courtesy staff.
The panel ordered Dr. Gagliano to attend before it to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 04, 2004
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 8, 2011, Dr. Gagliano has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.