THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:29:53 PM
Dalgleish, Philp Irvine Douglas
CPSO#:
15767
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Access Services Canada, Inc. (RASCI)
854 Upper Canada Drive
Sarnia, ON N7W 1A4
Tel: 800 971 8038 ext. 102
Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1956 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Dec 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 2, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 2, 2013, Dr. Dalgleish has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.