THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:34:12 PM
Librach, Samuel
CPSO#:
15480
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Dec 1955
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Call toll free at 1.800.775.0093, or www.recordregistry.ca
Effective Sept 1, 2013, records are to be stored at Records Management Ltd., 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:10 Nov 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1955 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |